The Board of Selectmen has been appointing several Darienites to various town boards and commissions and reappointing dozens more.
Here’s a list from recent Board of Selectmen meetings (some appointments and re-appointments were made well after the term of office had begun):
New Appointments:
- Jeff Smith to the Beautification Commission for a 3-year term beginning on December 1, 2014 and expiring on Nov. 30, 2017
- Gregg Karas to the Youth Commission for a 3-year term beginning on April 1, 2013 and expiring on March 31, 2016
- Mary Louise Morgan to the Parks & Recreation Commission for a 3-year term beginning on April 1, 2014 and expiring on March 31, 2017.
- Dennis Conetta to the Parks & Recreation Commission for a 3-year term beginning on April 1, 2015 and expiring on March 31, 2018
- Liz Geiger as an Alternate to the Architectural Review Board for a 4-year term beginning on July 1, 2015 and expiring on June 30, 2019
Re-appointments:
- Erika Morris to the Parks & Recreation Commission for a 3-year term beginning on April 1, 2015 and expiring on March 31, 2018.
- Keith Kearney to the Environmental Protection Commission for a 3-year term beginning on July 1, 2015 and expiring on June 30, 2018
- Eric Joosten to the Environmental Protection Commission for a 3-year term beginning on July 1, 2015 and expiring on June 30, 2018
- Jim Cameron to the Area Nine Cable Council, for a two-year term beginning July 1, 2015 and expiring on June 30, 2017
- David Deverto the Area Nine Cable Council, for a two-year term beginning July 1, 2015 and expiring on June 30, 201
- Kim Huffard to the Police Commission for a 3-year term beginning on July 1, 2015 and expiring on June 30, 2018
- Rocco Genovese to the Sewer Commission for a 3-year term beginning on January 1, 2014 and expiring on December 31, 2016
- Peter Van Winkle to the Sewer Commission for a 3-year term beginning on January 1, 2014 and expiring on December 31, 2016
- Geraldine Genovese to the Commission on Aging for a 3-year term beginning on April 1, 2014 and expiring on March 31, 2017
- Ray Slavin to the Commission on Aging for a 3-year term beginning on April 1, 2014 and expiring on March 31, 2017
- Amy Squyres to the Commission on Aging for a 3-year term beginning on April 1, 2015 and expiring on March 31, 2018
- Ron Heinbaugh to the Commission on Aging for a 3-year term beginning on April 1, 2015 and expiring on March 31, 2018
- Mary McCarthy to the Commission on Aging for a 3-year term beginning on April 1, 2014 and expiring on March 31, 2017
- Joe Pankowski to the Commission on Aging for a 3-year term beginning on April 1, 2015 and expiring on March 31, 2018
- Cindy Ryan to the Beautification Commission for a 3-year term beginning on December 1, 2014 and expiring on November 30, 2017
- Suzanne Schutte to the Beautification Commission for a 3-year term beginning on December 1, 2014 and expiring on November 30, 2017
- David Polett to the Monuments and Ceremonies Commission for a 3-year term beginning on December 1, 2014 and expiring on November 30, 2017
- Becky Siciliano to the Monuments and Ceremonies Commission for a 3-year term beginning on December 1, 2013 and expiring on November 30, 2016
- Marian Castell to the position of Town Historian for a 2-year term beginning on April 1, 2015 and expiring on March 31, 2017